Reports for Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A.
- Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A. in Monthey is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles». Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A. is active.
- The management of the company Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A., which was founded on the 18.01.1989, consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 17.08.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.553.696.
Management (4)
newest board members
Blaise Friderici,
Clément Paul René Friderici,
Stéphane Friderici
newest authorized signatories
Blaise Friderici,
Clément Paul René Friderici,
Stéphane Friderici,
Aysun Kilinç
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.01.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Monthey
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.122.461-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.553.696
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un garage de réparation de poids lourds, achat et vente de poids lourds.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Daniel Marmillod SA | Monthey | 19.05.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KUNZLE FIDUCIAIRE ET GERANCE SA | Monthey | 26.10.2005 | 18.05.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005818843, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A., à Monthey, CHE-101.553.696, société anonyme (No. FOSC 174 du 08.09.2021, Publ. 1005287272).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Gattoni, Roland Robert Emile, de Monthey, à Choëx (Monthey), président, avec signature individuelle;
Gattoni, Alain, de Monthey, à Collombey-Muraz, administrateur-délégué, avec signature individuelle;
Gattoni (née Schneiter), Yolande, de Monthey, à Choëx (Monthey), administratrice, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Friderici, Clément, de Allaman, à Goumoëns, président du conseil d'administration, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Friderici , Blaise, de Allaman, à Hautemorges, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Friderici, Stéphane, de Allaman, à Saint-Prex, membre du conseil d'administration, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Kilinç, Aysun, de Prilly, à Bussigny, directrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005287272, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A., à Monthey, CHE-101.553.696, société anonyme (No. FOSC 53 du 15.03.2012, Publ. 6596082).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Gattoni, Roland Pierre Fernand, de Monthey, à Troistorrents, directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gattoni, Alain, de Monthey, à Collombey-Muraz, administrateur-délégué, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur].
Publication number: 6596082, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Gattoni Maintenance Poids Lourds S.A., à Monthey, CH-550.0.122.461-2, société anonyme (No. FOSC 229 du 24.11.2011, Publ. 6431154).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gattoni, Roland Robert Emile, de Monthey, à Choëx (Monthey), président, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: Gattoni, Roland, à Monthey, administrateur avec signature individuelle];
Gattoni (née Schneiter), Yolande, de Monthey, à Choëx (Monthey), administratrice et secrétaire, avec signature individuelle;
Gattoni, Alain, de Monthey, à Collombey (Collombey-Muraz), directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur;
Gattoni, Roland Pierre Fernand, de Monthey, à Troistorrents, directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.