Address
c/o Beat Steimen
Im Tiergarten 20
8055 Zürich
Reports for Gastroenterology Foundation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gastroenterology Foundation
- Gastroenterology Foundation with its legal headquarters in Zürich is active. Gastroenterology Foundation operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Gastroenterology Foundation consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 06.01.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.609.107.
- On the same address as Gastroenterology Foundation there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Hildegard Hutzenlaub-Stiftung, Schweiz, International Emergency Care Foundation.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Alexander Meining,
Dr. Friedrich Hagenmüller,
Beat Adolf Steimen
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Alexander Meining,
Dr. Friedrich Hagenmüller,
Beat Adolf Steimen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.11.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.563-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.609.107
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Verbesserung der medizinischen Versorgung in weniger entwickelten Regionen der Welt und die Forschung mit den Schwerpunkten Krebsprävention und Endoskopie. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BRISE Treuhand GmbH | Lachen | 04.12.2008 | 07.07.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gastroenterology Foundation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005373485, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gastroenterology Foundation, in Zürich, CHE-114.609.107, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 10.02.2020, Publ. 1004825793).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huber, Dr. Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gmund (DE), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meining, Dr. Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Würzburg (DE), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004825793, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gastroenterology Foundation, in Zürich, CHE-114.609.107, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2019, Publ. 1004655449).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Classen, Dr. Meinhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Reith bei Kitzbühel (AT), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hagenmüller, Dr. Friedrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Huber, Dr. Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gmund (DE), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004655449, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gastroenterology Foundation, in Zürich, CHE-114.609.107, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 15.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2427779).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Dr. Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gmund (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.