Reports for GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG
- GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG with its legal headquarters in Engelberg is active. GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 15.02.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG is the following: CHE-109.572.912.
Management (8)
newest board members
Josef Walter Häcki,
Roger Filliger,
Caroline Järmann-Rutishauser,
Niklaus Eugen Reinhard,
Hannes Blatter
newest authorized signatories
Josef Walter Häcki,
Roger Filliger,
Caroline Järmann-Rutishauser,
Niklaus Eugen Reinhard,
Hannes Blatter
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.05.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Engelberg
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.002.442-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.572.912
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen aller Art mit Schwerpunkt im kulturellen Bereich. Insbesondere kauft, betreibt und vermietet sie das Gasthaus Grünenwald. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an Unternehmen beteiligen oder derartige Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten und finanzieren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Mahler Treuhand GmbH | Engelberg | 11.05.2016 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prowert AG | Luzern | 22.07.2008 | 10.05.2016 | |
Sepp Ettlin Treuhand | Engelberg | <2004 | 21.07.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005100612, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG, in Engelberg, CHE-109.572.912, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2016, Publ. 2826313).
Statutenänderung:
08.02.2021.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 441'000.00 [bisher: CHF 190'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 441'000.00 [bisher: CHF 190'000.00].
Aktien neu:
441 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 190 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Ordentliche Kapitalerhöhung vom 08.02.2021.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft beabsichtigt, nach der Gründung von der Erbengemeinschaft des Robert Infanger-Meier die Parzelle Nr. 938, Grundbuch Engelberg, Restaurant Grünenwald mit Gartenwirtschaft und Umgelände zum Preise von CHF 300'000.-- zu übernehmen.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Publication number: 2826313, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG, in Engelberg, CHE-109.572.912, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 04.05.2012, Publ. 6664890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Prowert AG, in Luzern ( CH-100.3.008.961-9), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Martin Mahler Treuhand GmbH ( CHE-105.657.840), in Engelberg, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6664890, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
GASTHAUS GRÜNENWALD AG, in Engelberg, CH-140.3.002.442-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 13.04.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6636536).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blatter, Hannes, von Hofstetten bei Brienz, in Sursee, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu dreien [bisher: in Luzern].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.