Reports for Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG
- Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG with its legal headquarters in Luzern is active. Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG operates in the sector «Operation of general healthcare facilities».
- The company was founded on 05.04.2011 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 06.10.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-494.090.314.
- On the same address there are 10 other active companies registered. These include: A & B Treuhand AG, INDRANI AG, Lakestone Capital Partners GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.792.725-1
UID/VAT
CHE-494.090.314
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung und Behandlung auf dem Gebiet der Podologie und der technischen Orthopädie; Herstellung und Anpassung podologischer und orthopädischer Hilfsmittel; Handel mit Produkten und Hilfsmitteln für Podologie und Orthopädie; Kauf, Verkauf und Bewirtschaftung von Grundstücken; Beteiligungen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005306060, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG, in Luzern, CHE-494.090.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2014, S.0, Publ. 1481879).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Céline, von Meggen, in Ebikon, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: 1481879, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG, in Luzern, CHE-494.090.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 08.04.2011, Publ. 6113416).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steger, Urs, von Luzern und Ettiswil, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6113416, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fuss-Praxis Schwanen AG, in Luzern, CH-100.3.792.725-1, Gerbergasse 1, 6004 Luzern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
31.03.2011.
Zweck:
Beratung und Behandlung auf dem Gebiet der Podologie und der technischen Orthopädie;
Herstellung und Anpassung podologischer und orthopädischer Hilfsmittel;
Handel mit Produkten und Hilfsmitteln für Podologie und Orthopädie;
Kauf, Verkauf und Bewirtschaftung von Grundstücken;
Beteiligungen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Gemäss Sacheinlage- und Sachübernahmevertrag vom 31.03.2011 und Bilanz per 01.01.2011 übernimmt die Gesellschaft von Dora Hirsiger, von Luzern, in Luzern, ihr im Handelsregister nicht eingetragenes Einzelunternehmen Fusspraxis Schwanen Dora Hirsiger, in Luzern, mit sämtlichen Aktiven, deren Wert zusammen CHF 159'642.23 beträgt und dem gesamten Fremdkapital im Werte von CHF 42'630.50 zum Preise von CHF 117'011.73, wofür 49 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben und CHF 68'011.73 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief oder E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 31.03.2011 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Malgaroli, Mario, von Amriswil, in Remetschwil, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hirsiger, Dora, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Steger, Urs, von Luzern und Ettiswil, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.