Reports for Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli
- Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli with its legal headquarters in Luzern is active. Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli has 4 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.08.2020.
- Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-109.774.137.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.01.1977
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.004.621-6
UID/VAT
CHE-109.774.137
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fürsorge für die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma bei Alter, Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität usw., bei ihrem Ableben für ihre Hinterbliebenen; ferner können bei unverschuldeter Notlage den im Dienste der Stifterfirma stehenden oder ehemaligen Arbeitnehmern sowie ihren Hinterbliebenen Unterstützungen gewährt werden; finanzielle Beihilfe an Pensionäre des Heim im Bergli sofern eine Notlage vorhanden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 10.07.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004950192, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli, in Luzern, CHE-109.774.137, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2020, Publ. 1004807574).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schurter, Dr. Thomas, von Luzern und Freienstein, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühler, Jürg, von Luzern und Weesen, in Luzern, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004807574, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli, in Luzern, CHE-109.774.137, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 02.06.2016, Publ. 2865439).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Notz, Silvia, von Malters, in Luzern, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Notz, Stephan, von Schleinikon, in Stans, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2865439, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Fürsorgestiftung Heim im Bergli, in Luzern, CHE-109.774.137, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.2013, Publ. 946117).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geisshüsler, Thomas, von Luzern und Beromünster, in Rüegsau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Notz, Silvia, von Malters, in Luzern, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Balmer-Etienne AG (CHE-107.252.508), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Balmer-Etienne AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.