Address
c/o Hans Peter Hausheer
St.-Johannes-Strasse 10
6300 Zug
Reports for Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger
- Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger with its legal headquarters in Zug is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 22.02.1993.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 08.04.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZG under the UID CHE-109.821.179.
- Companies with the same address as Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger: Compella GmbH, Hegglin Trading GmbH, Patrick Fischer GmbH.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Veronika Paula Straub-Müller,
Dr. Christoph Hohler,
Hans-Peter Hausheer
newest authorized signatories
Veronika Paula Straub-Müller,
Dr. Christoph Hohler,
Hans-Peter Hausheer,
Bernhard Uhlmann
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.02.1993
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.7.000.476-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.821.179
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Restfinanzierung des Baus des Alters- und Pflegeheims der Althof-Stiftung Walchwil an der Hinterbergstrasse in Walchwil gemäss dem beschlossenen Projekt, sowie Sicherstellung des Betriebs zu tragbaren Bedingungen für die Pensionäre. Darüber hinaus unterstützt die Stiftung weitere soziale Werke der Altersfürsorge, der Blinden- und Multiple-Sklerose-Pflege, der SOS-Kinderdörfer sowie ähnlicher Institutionen zum Schutze und zum Unterhalt behinderter und gefährdeter Bevölkerungsgruppen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unitas treuhandgesellschaft AG, Zweigniederlassung Galgenen | Galgenen | 02.07.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006003027, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger, in Zug, CHE-109.821.179, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 13.05.2022, Publ. 1005473042).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
unitas treuhandgesellschaft AG, Zweigniederlassung Galgenen (CHE-239.316.219), in Galgenen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Unitas Treuhandgesellschaft, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau, in Wollerau].
Publication number: HR02-1005473042, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger, in Zug, CHE-109.821.179, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 26.05.2020, Publ. 1004896731).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Dr. Albert, von Gersau, in Zug, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Straub-Müller, Veronika Paula, genannt Vroni, von Gersau, in Zug, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004896731, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Fürsorgestiftung Althof-Weidinger, in Zug, CHE-109.821.179, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.2020, Publ. 1004799935).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hohler, Christoph, von Unterägeri, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.