Reports for FRS Invest AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FRS Invest AG
- FRS Invest AG is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Aesch BL.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 18.06.2018.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 22.07.2022.
- In the commercial register the company FRS Invest AG is registered under the UID CHE-335.832.190.
- On the same address as FRS Invest AG there are 23 other active companies registered. These include: AQIPTECH AG, Blue System Technology Group AG, BTG-Bürgschaftsgenossenschaft beider Basel.
Management (5)
newest board members
Benjamin Rosengarten,
Félicie Rosengarten,
Michael Spitzer,
Moses Jakob Rosengarten,
Kurt Willi Strecker
newest authorized signatories
Benjamin Rosengarten,
Félicie Rosengarten,
Michael Spitzer,
Moses Jakob Rosengarten,
Kurt Willi Strecker
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.06.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.022.428-6
UID/VAT
CHE-335.832.190
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Beteiligung an Unternehmen aller Art im In- und Ausland sowie deren Finanzierung. Die Gesellschaft kann die Führung der Tochter- und Beteiligungsgesellschaften übernehmen. Sie ist ferner befugt, Grundstücke sowie Immaterialgüterrechte zu kaufen, zu halten und zu veräussern, Lizenzen zu erwerben und zu verleihen, Darlehen aufzunehmen und zu gewähren sowie alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchzuführen, die Verwirklichung ihres Zwecks förderlich sein könnten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 21.06.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FRS Invest SA
- FRS Invest Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FRS Invest AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005527133, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
FRS Invest AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-335.832.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2021, Publ. 1005289981).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosengarten, Benjamin, von Egg, in Jerusalem (IL), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rosengarten, Félicie, von Egg, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005289981, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
FRS Invest AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-335.832.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2020, Publ. 1005030305).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rosengarten, Elijahn, von Egg, in Engelberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005030305, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
FRS Invest AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-335.832.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 12.11.2019, Publ. 1004757470).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosengarten, Elijahn, von Egg, in Engelberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.