Reports for Frero AG Natursteine
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Frero AG Natursteine
- Frero AG Natursteine in Boswil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». Frero AG Natursteine is active.
- Frero AG Natursteine was founded on 07.04.2008.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.03.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-114.162.796.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Helena Häusler,
Alexander Tilgner,
Martin Tobler,
Gregor Barmet,
Marc Schega
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Boswil
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.030.421-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.162.796
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion und Handel mit Natursteinen, Strassenbaustoffen, Baumaterialien und sonstigen artverwandten Produkten; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen und veräussern sowie Kapitalanlagen aller Art halten und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden | Weinfelden | 11.04.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Frero AG Natursteine
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005994923, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Frero AG Natursteine, in Boswil, CHE-114.162.796, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2024, Publ. 1005940352).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tilgner, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wehr (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häusler, Helena, von Gondiswil, in Grabs, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005940352, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Frero AG Natursteine, in Boswil, CHE-114.162.796, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2021, Publ. 1005297460).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Merino Rotonda, Mario, von Münsterlingen, in Berg (TG), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Tilgner, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wehr (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tobler, Martin, von Speicher, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Barmet, Gregor, von Eschenbach (LU), in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schega, Marc, von Uetikon am See, in Knonau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005297460, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Frero AG Natursteine, in Boswil, CHE-114.162.796, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 30.12.2015, Publ. 2572481).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Merino Rotonda, Mario, von Münsterlingen, in Berg (TG), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Münsterlingen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.