Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.01.1995
Deletion from the commercial register
17.03.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.312-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.819.159
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Anlage und Verwaltung der ihr von der Freizügigkeitsstiftung der UBS AG anvertrauten Gelder zur Förderung der gebundenen Vorsorge.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG
- Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der SBG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4389154, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CH-020.7.000.312-8, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2006, S. 27, Publ. 3685484). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Stiftung wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3685484, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG, in Zürich, CH-020.7.000.312-8, Anlage und Verwaltung der ihr von der Freizügigkeitsstiftung der UBS AG anvertrauten Gelder zur Förderung der gebundenen Vorsorge, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2005, S. 22, Publ. 2881200).
Name neu:
Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 18.10.2006 aufgehoben.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Deubelbeiss, Dr. Rudolf, von Veltheim AG, in Bäretswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Andenmatten, Ernst, von Saas Almagell, in Basel, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Balet, Georges-André, von Grimisuat, in Basel, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Rohner, Urs, von Basel und Reute AR, in Muttenz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Siegrist, Heinz, von Seengen und Zürich, in Schwerzenbach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Valente, André, von Hermiswil, in Muttenz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Liebold, Armin Joachim, von Birsfelden, in Muttenz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Nellen, Marcel, von Naters, in Rüdlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heim, Christian, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Stamm, Maya, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlatter, Andreas, von Gontenschwil, in Wettswil am Albis, Präsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident];
Koch, Markus, von Buchrain, in Buchrain, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied];
Pawlowsky, Peter, von Basel, in Hofstetten SO, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied];
Zeller, Beat, von Walenstadt und Quarten, in Stäfa, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied].
Publication number: 2881200, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Freizügigkeits-Anlagestiftung der UBS AG, in Zürich, CH-020.7.000.312-8, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 31.05.2005, S. 21, Publ. 2860398).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Salzmann, Marcel, von Eggiwil, in Kilchberg ZH, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.