Reports for Freeberg GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Freeberg GmbH
- Freeberg GmbH has its legal headquarters in Buchs SG, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- Freeberg GmbH was founded on 20.01.2009.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 02.02.2021.
- In the commercial register the company Freeberg GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-114.678.841.
Management (6)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Igor Alinjak,
Florian Lippuner,
Michael Jakob Bereiter,
Michael Johannes Eberli,
Vinzenz Felix Blaas
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.01.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Buchs (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.064.632-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.678.841
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung von und den Service an Sportartikeln und den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Des weiteren Planung und Durchführung von Sport- und Kulturveranstaltungen und Organisationen aller Art sowie die Schulung und Beratung in den entsprechenden Bereichen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Freeberg GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005089634, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Freeberg GmbH, in Buchs (SG), CHE-114.678.841, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2012, S.0, Publ. 6994384).
Domizil neu:
Wiedenstrasse 50b, 9470 Buchs SG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nüesch, Thomas, von Balgach, in Grabs, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nüesch, Katrin, von Balgach, in Walenstadt, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 6994384, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Freeberg GmbH, in Buchs SG, CH-320.4.064.632-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2009, S. 12, Publ. 4913550).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dobbelaere, Jimi, von Sarn, in Grabs, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Alinjak, Igor, von Grabs, in Grabs, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), Gesellschafter mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Bereiter, Michael, von Vilters-Wangs, in Walenstadt, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Werdenberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Blaas, Vinzenz, von Grabs, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Lippuner, Florian, von Grabs, in Grabs, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Nüesch, Thomas, von Balgach, in Grabs, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 4913550, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Freeberg GmbH, in Buchs SG, CH-320.4.064.632-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 26.01.2009, S. 13, Publ. 4844868).
Domizil neu:
Altendorferstrasse 16a, 9470 Buchs.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.