Reports for FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A.
- FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A. in Glovelier is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments». FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A. is active.
- FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A. was founded on 11.02.2000.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.05.2021.
- FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A. is registered in the Canton of JU under the UID CHE-105.385.794.
Management (4)
newest board members
Marie Sarah Miauton,
Jean-Jacques Paul Didier Miauton,
Alain André Maurice Sierro
newest authorized signatories
Marie Sarah Miauton,
Thibaut Marcel Anthony Koller,
Jean-Jacques Paul Didier Miauton,
Alain André Maurice Sierro
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.02.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Haute-Sorne
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.002.346-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.385.794
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication, commercialisation de cadrans de montres et toutes activités liées à l'horlogerie; la société peut assumer des participations à toutes entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquérir ou créer des entreprises semblables ou similaires et se charger de toutes opérations ou fonctions de nature à développer son but ou ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet. Elle peut acquérir, détenir ou aliéner des immeubles.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Lausanne | 28.06.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidexaudit révision SA | Lausanne | 17.12.2014 | 27.06.2018 | |
Cabinet d'Audit et d'Expertises SA en liquidation | Delémont | <2004 | 16.02.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FRAPORLUX SWISS SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005185539, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A., à Haute-Sorne, CHE-105.385.794, société anonyme (No. FOSC 37 du 23.02.2021, Publ. 1005108360).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Blum, Pierre Charles Alain, dit Pierre-Alain, de Val-de-Travers, à Colombier NE (Milvignes), membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Guignard, Raphaël, de Le Lieu, à Vuarrens, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005108360, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A., à Haute-Sorne, CHE-105.385.794, société anonyme (No. FOSC 18 du 27.01.2021, Publ. 1005085398).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Miauton, Marie Sarah, de Avenches, à Lutry, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005085398, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
FRAPORLUX SWISS S.A., à Haute-Sorne, CHE-105.385.794, société anonyme (No. FOSC 244 du 17.12.2019, Publ. 1004785984).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Miauton, Jean-Jacques Paul Didier, de Avenches, à Crans-Montana, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Lutry].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.