Reports for Forventis GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Forventis GmbH
- Forventis GmbH from Zürich operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- Forventis GmbH was founded on 04.12.2009.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 04.07.2018. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Forventis GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-115.258.938.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.041.441-0
UID/VAT
CHE-115.258.938
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Beratungsprojekten im Bereich Human Factors und Sicherheitsmanagement sowie Dienstleistungen im Bereich Aviatik. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Forventis GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4334143, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Forventis GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-115.258.938, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2017, Publ. 3906525).
Domizil neu:
Predigergasse 19, 8001 Zürich.
Publication number: 3906525, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Forventis GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-115.258.938, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2011, Publ. 6010840).
Statutenänderung:
17.11.2017.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Beratungsprojekten im Bereich Human Factors und Sicherheitsmanagement sowie Dienstleistungen im Bereich Aviatik. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Publication number: 6010840, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Forventis GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.041.441-0, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 10.12.2009, S. 29, Publ. 5384742).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lohse, Andrea, von Dinhard, in Dinhard, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 75 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Noser, Philip, von Oberurnen, in Niederrohrdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 75 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Samuel, von Hirzel, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 150 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 75 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Schweiter, Martin, von Männedorf, in Hombrechtikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 150 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher:mit 75 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.