Address
c/o ATHEMIS GESTION SA
Rue du Môle 1
2000 Neuchâtel
Reports for FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD
- FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Neuchâtel.
- FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD has 3 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 24.02.2022.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of NE under the UID CHE-250.470.900.
- On the same address there are 21 other active companies registered. These include: AJUST Sàrl, ANEO Sàrl, ATHEMIS GESTION SA.
Management (3)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Muriel Héritier,
Richard Michel Bonnet,
Micheline Salvisberg
newest authorized signatories
Muriel Héritier,
Richard Michel Bonnet,
Micheline Salvisberg
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.11.2016
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuchâtel
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.114.226-4
UID/VAT
CHE-250.470.900
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Payer des frais d'éducation, d'établissement et d'assistance aux membres de la famille d'Auguste Berthoud.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005414036, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD, à Neuchâtel, CHE-250.470.900 (FOSC du 15.02.2022, p. 0/1005406328). L'inscription n° 420 du 10.02.2022 est rectifiée en ce sens que Héritier Muriel, présidente du conseil de fondation, signe individuellement (et non pas collectivement à deux).
Publication number: HR02-1005406328, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD, à Neuchâtel, CHE-250.470.900 (FOSC du 07.11.2016, p. 0/3147993). Dumont Jean Maurice n'est plus membre et président du conseil de fondation;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Héritier Muriel, de Mühleberg, à Val-de-Ruz, est membre et présidente du conseil de fondation avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3147993, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
FONDS DE LA FAMILLE BERTHOUD, à Neuchâtel, rue du Môle 1, c/o ATHEMIS GESTION SA, 2000 Neuchâtel, CHE-250.470.900. Nouvelle fondation. Statuts du 15.04.1921, modifiés en dernier lieu le 25.10.2016.
But:
payer des frais d'éducation, d'établissement et d'assistance aux membres de la famille d'Auguste Berthoud.
Conseil de fondation:
Dumont Jean Maurice, de Val-de-Travers, à Pully, président, Bonnet Richard Michel, de Satigny, à Sion, vice-président, et Salvisberg Micheline, de Mühleberg, à Courtepin, secrétaire, lesquels signent collectivement à deux. La fondation est une fondation de famille qui n'est pas soumise à une surveillance étatique et n'a pas l'obligation de désigner un organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.