Address
Rue du Progrès 48
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds
Reports for Fondation Ton sur Ton
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Ton sur Ton
- Fondation Ton sur Ton in La Chaux-de-Fonds is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Fondation Ton sur Ton is active.
- The management of the organization Fondation Ton sur Ton, which was founded on the 23.12.2005, consists of 13 persons.
- On the 04.06.2018 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Fondation Ton sur Ton is registered in the Canton of NE under the UID CHE-112.697.023.
Management (13)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Isabelle Augsburger,
Vérène Andrée Girod,
Baptiste Gérémie Pfeiffer,
Bastien Reber,
Cyril Pipoz
newest authorized signatories
Isabelle Augsburger,
Vérène Andrée Girod,
Baptiste Gérémie Pfeiffer,
Bastien Reber,
Cyril Pipoz
Executive board
Théo Bregnard,
Fabien Paul Fivaz,
Christophe Studer,
Julien Revilloud,
Quentin Donzé
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.2005
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
La Chaux-de-Fonds
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.099.171-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.697.023
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Constituer un centre de formation artistique régional intégré dans les filières nationales de la formation artistique; former des étudiants jusqu'au niveau pré-professionnel, les préparer aux concours d'entrée des Hautes Ecoles; favoriser une culture de loisir, participative, amateure, à la portée de tous; mettre l'immeuble sis Progrès 48 à La Chaux-de-Fonds et son infrastructure fonctionnelle dont elle est propriétaire à disposition prioritairement aux membres du conseil du corps enseignant ainsi qu'à des tiers et des sociétés locales afin d'en faire un centre culturel, pédagogique et artistique; en assurer l'exploitation, le fonctionnement et le rayonnement.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Leitenberg & Associés SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 23.09.2014 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduhal, Patrick Haldimann, Expert comptable diplômé | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 07.06.2013 | 22.09.2014 | |
Fénart Eric - FIREC | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 10.07.2012 | 06.06.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Ton sur Ton
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4267419, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Ton sur Ton, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-112.697.023 (FOSC du 09.01.2017, p. 0/3270579). Augsburger Isabelle, de Langnau im Emmental, à Enges, et Girod Vérène Andrée, de Monthey, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, sont membres du conseil de fondation avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3270579, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Ton sur Ton, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-112.697.023 (FOSC du 04.11.2016, p. 0/3145153). Revilloud Julien et Studer Christophe, membres du comité directeurs, ne sont plus membres du conseil de fondation;
ils continuent de signer collectivement à deux. Delémont Jean-Jacques Edouard, de Les Bois, Pipoz Cyril, de Val-de-Charmey, Reber Bastien, de Kriechenwil, tous trois à La Chaux-de-Fonds, et Voumard Hugues Bertrand, de Tramelan, ainsi que Pfeiffer Baptiste Gérémie, de La Chaux-de-Fonds, tous deux à Neuchâtel, sont membres du conseil de fondation avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3145153, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Fondation Ton sur Ton, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-112.697.023 (FOSC du 23.09.2014, p. 0/1728623).
But modifié:
constituer un centre de formation artistique régional intégré dans les filières nationales de la formation artistique;
former des étudiants jusqu'au niveau pré-professionnel, les préparer aux concours d'entrée des Hautes Ecoles;
favoriser une culture de loisir, participative, amateure, à la portée de tous;
mettre l'immeuble sis Progrès 48 à La Chaux-de-Fonds et son infrastructure fonctionnelle dont elle est propriétaire à disposition prioritairement aux membres du conseil du corps enseignant ainsi qu'à des tiers et des sociétés locales afin d'en faire un centre culturel, pédagogique et artistique;
en assurer l'exploitation, le fonctionnement et le rayonnement. Statuts modifiés le 16.08.2016.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.