Reports for Fondation Swiss Education Group
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Swiss Education Group
- Fondation Swiss Education Group has its legal headquarters in Bouveret, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management consists of 8 persons. The organization was founded on 26.06.2018.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 26.08.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-367.390.693.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Alain Bélizaire,
Cédric Georges Paul Fabry,
Tanja Florenthal,
Ulrika Anne-Marie Björklund Devapura,
Claire Carole Jollain
newest authorized signatories
Alain Bélizaire,
Cédric Georges Paul Fabry,
Tanja Florenthal,
Ulrika Anne-Marie Björklund Devapura,
Claire Carole Jollain
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.06.2018
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Port-Valais
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.7.006.844-9
UID/VAT
CHE-367.390.693
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Promouvoir et faciliter l'accès à l'enseignement de la gestion hôtelière en distribuant des bourses d'études aux élèves scolarisés dans l'une des écoles suisses du groupe Swiss Education Group et aux nouveaux élèves appelés à rejoindre l'une des écoles suisses du groupe Swiss Education Group, qui remplissent les conditions fixées par la Fondation; la Fondation ne poursuit pas de but économique.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 29.06.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Swiss Education Group
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006114461, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Swiss Education Group, à Port-Valais, CHE-367.390.693, fondation (No. FOSC 77 du 21.04.2022, Publ. 1005455786).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Donnet, Christophe, de Genève, à Collonge-Bellerive, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Feij, Iwan, citoyen français, à Lutry, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Lambert, Emanuelle, de Rüegsau, à Epalinges, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Navarro, Silvana Mariane, citoyenne italienne, à Armoy (FR), membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Zoppelletto, Pierre Matteo, de Montreux, à Port-Valais, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Belizaire, Alain, de Kerzers, à Port-Valais, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Björklund Devapura, Ulrika Anne-Marie, de La Tour-de-Peilz, à La Tour-de-Peilz, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Fabry, Cédric Georges Paul, de Noble-Contrée, à Pully, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Fercher Geis, Tarsila, de Naters, à Montreux, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Florenthal, Tanja, de Zürich, à Port-Valais, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005455786, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Swiss Education Group, à Port-Valais, CHE-367.390.693, fondation (No. FOSC 224 du 19.11.2019, Publ. 1004763094).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Vocat, Verica, de Crans-Montana, à Montreux, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Donnet, Christophe, de Genève, à Collonge-Bellerive, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Feij, Iwan, citoyen français, à Lutry, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Jollain, Claire Carole, citoyenne française, à Vevey, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Lambert, Emanuelle, de Rüegsau, à Epalinges, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Navarro, Silvana Mariane, citoyenne italienne, à Armoy (FR), membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004763094, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Fondation Swiss Education Group, à Port-Valais, CHE-367.390.693, fondation (No. FOSC 222 du 15.11.2019, Publ. 1004760905).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Samson, Benoit Pierre Marie, de Leysin, à Genève, membre du conseil de fondation, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.