Address
c/o Sept Finance SA
Rue Albert-Gos 3
1206 Genève
Reports for Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève
- Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève has its legal headquarters in Genève and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 04.07.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GE is CHE-211.676.303.
- On the same address there are 7 other active companies registered. These include: ARS Antiqua SA, Et architecte, titulaire Do Amaral Trindade, FONDATION DES DROITS DE L'HOMME AU TRAVAIL.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Lucie Barbier-Mueller,
Alexander Barclay,
Costin van Berchem,
Pascal Yves Bertil Gueissaz
newest authorized signatories
Lucie Barbier-Mueller,
Alexander Barclay,
Costin van Berchem,
Pascal Yves Bertil Gueissaz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.2011
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.811.011-6
UID/VAT
CHE-211.676.303
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Oeuvrer en faveur de l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève, en veillant à s'ouvrir aux autres religions et à sensibiliser la jeunesse (cf. acte de fondation pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Audit SA | Genève | 22.12.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Thornton AG, succursale à Genève | Genève | 22.04.2022 | 21.12.2022 | |
Grant Thornton Spiess SA | Genève | 23.05.2019 | 21.04.2022 | |
Fiduciaire Jacques Morand | Genève | 14.04.2011 | 30.06.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006076331, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève, à Genève, CHE-211.676.303 (FOSC du 30.05.2023, p. 0/1005756285). Barbier-Mueller Lucie, de Grône, à Veyrier est membre du conseil de fondation avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005756285, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève, à Genève, CHE-211.676.303 (FOSC du 22.12.2022, p. 0/1005636642). Barclay Alexander, nommé secrétaire, et van Berchem Costin, nommé trésorier, continuent à signer collectivement à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005636642, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Fondation pour l'enseignement de la théologie protestante à Genève, à Genève, CHE-211.676.303 (FOSC du 22.04.2022, p. 0/1005456950). Grant Thornton AG (CHE-153.284.948) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
BfB Audit SA (CHE-229.540.413), à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.