Address
c/o Ateliers de la Glâne
Route de l'Industrie 3
1680 Romont FR
Reports for Fondation Handicap Glâne
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Handicap Glâne
- Fondation Handicap Glâne has its legal headquarters in Romont FR and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities».
- The management has 10 active persons registered.
- On the 01.07.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-110.377.990.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christine Simone Georgette Ruef Bayiha,
Patrick Armand Peyter,
Valentin Olivier Bard,
Jean-Luc Chassot,
Nicolas Charles Corpataux
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.09.1985
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Romont (FR)
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.370.029-3
UID/VAT
CHE-110.377.990
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La prise en charge spécialisée de personnes en situation de handicaps ou de retards de développement, dans les domaines de l'instruction, l'éducation, la formation, le travail, l'occupation et l'hébergement. Elle constitue le support juridique et assume la gestion des Ateliers de la Glâne, du Home-atelier la Colline à Ursy, des Appartements de la Glâne et du Centre d'enseignement spécialisé et de logopédie de la Glâne (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. | Bulle | 25.11.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Butty SA | Ursy | 23.12.2013 | 24.11.2019 | |
BDO SA | Villars-sur-Glâne | 04.02.2010 | 22.12.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation glânoise en faveur de personnes handicapées mentales et IMC
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Handicap Glâne
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006071427, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Handicap Glâne, à Romont (FR), CHE-110.377.990 (FOSC du 29.04.2022, p. 0/1005461514).
Personnes radiées:
Chassot Jacqueline, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Schlosser Emilie Suzanne, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Schorderet Willy Pascal, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Bard Valentin Olivier, de Semsales, à Romont FR, sans signature;
Peyter Patrick Armand, de Vevey, à Ursy, sans signature;
Ruef Bayiha Christine Simone Georgette, de Oberried am Brienzersee, à Ursy, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005461514, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Handicap Glâne, à Romont (FR), CHE-110.377.990 (FOSC du 16.07.2021, p. 0/1005251156).
Personne radiée:
Schmid Thierry Gérard, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005251156, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation Handicap Glâne, à Romont (FR), CHE-110.377.990 (FOSC du 25.11.2019, p. 0/1004767101).
Personne radiée:
Chavaz Jacques, membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Balmer Johann, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Corpataux Nicolas Charles, membre du conseil de fondation, vice-président, signature collective à deux, avec le président, maintenant membre du conseil de fondation, président, signature collective à deux;
Chassot Jean-Luc, membre du conseil de fondation, secrétaire, signature collective à deux, avec le président, maintenant de et à Villaz (fusion de commune), membre du conseil de fondation, vice-président, secrétaire, signature collective à deux, avec le président.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Jaquier Armand Alfred, de Siviriez, à Romont FR, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Overney Matthieu Jean, de Chénens, à Cottens FR, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Schlosser Emilie Suzanne, de et à Ursy, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.