Reports for Fondation Edouard Vallet
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Edouard Vallet
- Fondation Edouard Vallet in Vercorin is a Foundation from the sector «Trading with various goods». Fondation Edouard Vallet is active.
- Fondation Edouard Vallet was founded on 07.07.2011.
- The last commercial register change was made on 17.08.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Fondation Edouard Vallet is registered under the UID CHE-279.810.603.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Isaline Pfefferlé,
Marie-Françoise Pauline Perruchoud-Massy,
David Luisier,
Françoise Luisier,
Claire Marie Joudié-Papon
newest authorized signatories
Isaline Pfefferlé,
Marie-Françoise Pauline Perruchoud-Massy,
David Luisier,
Françoise Luisier,
Claire Marie Joudié-Papon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.07.2011
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Chalais
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.7.013.719-9
UID/VAT
CHE-279.810.603
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
D'utiliser, de mettre en valeur, de conserver, de rénover et d'entretenir la maison de l'artiste Edouard Vallet, et son jardin, d'aménager un musée ainsi que des salles d'exposition et de réception, de mettre en valeur et d'exposer son mobilier et ses objets d'art, à des fins artistiques, culturelles, scientifiques et de relations publiques; de faire connaître l'artiste Edouard Vallet, ainsi que sa première épouse, l'artiste Marguerite Vallet-Gilliard, et leur ouvre, par l'organisation d'expositions, de conférences, par des publications et par tous autres moyens; d'organiser des expositions permanentes et temporaires, de même que des séminaires et conférences sur différents artistes ou personnalités; d'acquérir, d'échanger et de vendre toute ouvre des artistes; de procéder, avec d'autres institutions à des prêts ou échanges d'ouvres, à court ou à long terme (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | 17.08.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultec, conseil d'entreprises et fiduciaire SA en liquidation | Sierre | 12.07.2011 | 16.08.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Edouard Vallet
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005818853, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edouard Vallet, à Chalais, CHE-279.810.603, fondation (No. FOSC 240 du 09.12.2021, Publ. 1005353708).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Caragnano, Leyla Angela, de Clos du Doubs, à Troinex, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Nessi, Antonia, de Vacallo, à Neuchâtel, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Consultec, conseil d'entreprises et fiduciaire SA (CH-626.3.002.340-9), à Sierre, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Perruchoud, Marie Françoise Pauline, de Chalais, à Chalais, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Pfefferlé, Isaline, de Sion, à Sion, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
NOFIVAL SA (CHE-107.401.228), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005353708, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edouard Vallet, à Chalais, CHE-279.810.603, fondation (No. FOSC 85 du 03.05.2018, Publ. 4210669).
Autres adresses:
[biffé: c/o M. Michel LUISIER, Route de Soral 9, 1232 Confignon].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Luisier, Michel, de Onex, à Confignon, président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Luisier, Françoise, de Onex, à Genève, présidente du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Luisier, David, de Onex, à Confignon, membre et secrétaire du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux];
Caragnano, Leyla Angela, de Clos du Doubs, à Troinex, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux;
Joudié-Papon, Claire Marie, de Payerne, à Lausanne, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 4210669, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edouard Vallet, à Chalais, CHE-279.810.603, fondation (No. FOSC 66 du 08.04.2015, Publ. 2085013).
Nouvelle autorité de surveillance:
Département de la sécurité, des institutions et du sport (DSIS).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.