Reports for Flück Luzern AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Flück Luzern AG
- Flück Luzern AG is currently active and the industry «General structural engineering». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The management of the company Flück Luzern AG, which was founded on the 28.01.2004, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.10.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-110.504.573.
Management (3)
newest board members
Truls Henrik Toggenburger,
Hans Bernhard Flück,
Harald Flückiger
newest authorized signatories
Truls Henrik Toggenburger,
Hans Bernhard Flück,
Harald Flückiger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.027.740-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.504.573
CHE-451.391.658 VAT
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Kranarbeiten aller Art sowie Logistik und Dienstleistung am Bau; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eugster Treuhand AG | Dübendorf | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Flück Luzern AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005862246, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Flück Luzern AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.504.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 01.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1851803).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brendolise, Nina, von Zürich, in Fällanden, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Toggenburger, Truls H., von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Flück, Hans, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Flückiger, Harald, von Wynigen, in Zuzwil (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1851803, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Flück Luzern AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.504.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 23.06.2014, Publ. 1567515).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brendolise, Nina, von Zürich, in Fällanden, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Flück, Nina, in Zürich].
Publication number: 1567515, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Flück Luzern AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.504.573, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2013, Publ. 1143921).
Statutenänderung:
28.03.2014.
Zweck neu:
Ausführung von Kranarbeiten aller Art sowie Logistik und Dienstleistung am Bau;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum;
Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 250'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 250'000.00].
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00. [bisher: 250 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der Kapitalherabsetzung vom 28.03.2014 werden 150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 vernichtet und der Herabsetzungsbetrag von CHF 150'000.00 auf dem Aktionärskonto gutgeschrieben;
die Beachtung der gesetzlichen Vorschriften von Art. 734 OR wird mit öffentlicher Urkunde vom 10.06.2014 festgestellt. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster Treuhand AG (CHE-107.161.395), in Dübendorf, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Eugster Treuhand AG (CH-020.3.908.271-6)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.