Reports for Finanz Infra AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Finanz Infra AG
- Finanz Infra AG has its legal headquarters in Laax GR 2, is active and operates in the sector «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof».
- The management of the company Finanz Infra AG consists of 6 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 18.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Finanz Infra AG is the following: CHE-112.249.570.
- Greenstyle-Foundation, Gurtner Holding AG, Larnags AG have the same address as Finanz Infra AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Martin Hug,
Norbert Good,
Maurus Caflisch,
Franz Gschwend,
Reto Gurtner
newest authorized signatories
Martin Hug,
Norbert Good,
Maurus Caflisch,
Franz Gschwend,
Adrian Wolf
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Laax
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.008.178-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.249.570
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erstellung und Finanzierung der benötigten Grundinfrastruktur für Skipisten und Beschneiungsanlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann insbesondere derartige Anlagen erwerben, aus- und neu bauen sowie an die direkten Leistungsbringer zu günstigen und kostendeckenden Bedingungen vermieten. Zum Wohle einer nachhaltigen Entwicklung der Tourismusregion Flims Laax Falera ist die Gewinnstrebigkeit jedoch kein Ziel der Gesellschaft. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben und sich an anderen Gesellchaften beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Curia AG | Chur | 18.06.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand-kanzlei ag | Ilanz/Glion | 19.04.2021 | 17.06.2024 | |
Capol & Partner AG | Chur | 20.04.2018 | 18.04.2021 | |
ADDISSA AG | Ilanz/Glion | 26.05.2015 | 19.04.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Finanz Infra AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006060084, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Finanz Infra AG, in Laax, CHE-112.249.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 19.04.2021, Publ. 1005152740).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Casutt-Cathomen , Wendelin, von Falera, in Falera, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
treuhand-kanzlei ag (CHE-107.061.351), in Ilanz/Glion, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hug, Martin, von Untervaz, in Flims, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Good, Norbert, von Mels, in Falera, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Curia AG (CHE-107.060.819), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005152740, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Finanz Infra AG, in Laax, CHE-112.249.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 11.12.2020, Publ. 1005045525).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiger, Adrian, von Wigoltingen, in Flims, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Capol & Partner AG (CHE-101.876.739), in Chur, Revisionsstelle;
De Giorgi, Romano, von Blenio, in Flims, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Casutt-Cathomen , Wendelin, von Falera, in Falera, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hug, Martin, von Untervaz, in Flims, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wolf, Adrian, von Untervaz, in Flims, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
treuhand-kanzlei ag (CHE-107.061.351), in Ilanz/Glion, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005045525, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Finanz Infra AG, in Laax, CHE-112.249.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 03.03.2020, Publ. 1004843548).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cahenzli, Stefan, von Trin, in Trin, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gschwend, Franz, von Altstätten, in Laax, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Steiger, Adrian, von Wigoltingen, in Flims, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Caflisch, Maurus, von Trin, in Trin, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Casutt-Cathomen , Wendelin, von Falera, in Falera, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.