Reports for Fiber Optic P. + P. AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fiber Optic P. + P. AG
- Fiber Optic P. + P. AG is currently active and the industry «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances». The legal headquarters are in Spreitenbach.
- The management of the company Fiber Optic P. + P. AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 05.06.1974.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.11.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-107.135.481.
- On the same address as Fiber Optic P. + P. AG there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: AHS Haustechnik GmbH, ATSchreinerei Ahmetaj, DS Haustechnik GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.06.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Spreitenbach
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.003.050-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.135.481
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von, Handel mit und Vertretung von insbesondere faseroptischen und optischen Bauteilen und Geräten für industrielle und medizinische Zwecke, sowie Beratung und Serviceleistungen; die Gesellschaft kann einschlägige Patente und Lizenzen erwerben, Filialen und Niederlassungen errichten sowie sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schnell Treuhand AG | Stäfa | 26.02.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Werner Schnellmann Treuhand AG | Brütten | 09.10.2014 | 25.02.2018 | |
Werner Schnellmann | Brütten | 05.10.2011 | 08.10.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fiber Optic P + P AG
- Fiber Optik P. + P. AG
- Fiber E. + P. Optik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fiber Optic P. + P. AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005615352, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Fiber Optic P. + P. AG, in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.135.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 27.12.2019, Publ. 1004793988).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Kurt, von Hettlingen, in Hettlingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfister, Urs, von Wädenswil, in Seengen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Pfister-Khoshmanzar, Nayme, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Seengen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004793988, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Fiber Optic P. + P. AG, in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.135.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2018, Publ. 4077329).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfister, Christian, von Wädenswil, in Oetwil an der Limmat, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4077329, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Fiber Optic P. + P. AG, in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.135.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 09.10.2014, Publ. 1759611).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Werner Schnellmann Treuhand AG, in Brütten, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schnell Treuhand AG (CHE-108.473.325), in Stäfa, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.