Reports for FG Next Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FG Next Holding AG
- FG Next Holding AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Zug. FG Next Holding AG belongs to the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active.
- The management of the company FG Next Holding AG consists of 5 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 08.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company FG Next Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.007.135.
- Companies with the same address as FG Next Holding AG: Adelbar Holding AG, Adorea Holding AG, ALMAGEST LABS AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Florian Wolfgang Marxer,
Urs Peter Gauch,
Giorgio Saraco,
Peter Felder,
Daniel Rudolf Salzmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.08.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.033.623-7
UID/VAT
CHE-115.007.135
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten, die Verwaltung und das Verwerten von direkten und indirekten Beteiligungen im In- und Ausland. Sie kann Finanzierungsgeschäfte aller Art durchführen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, gewerbliche Schutzrechte erwerben, halten und verwerten, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien oder andere Sicherheiten gewähren und sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit den vorgenannten Zwecken zusammenhängen, solange solche Geschäfte keine Bewilligungen gemäss dem Bundesgesetz über den Erwerb von Grundstücken durch Personen im Ausland (BewG) erfordern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wadsack Zug AG | Zug | 27.08.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
LWB7 AG in Liquidation | Zug | 16.11.2011 | 26.08.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FG Next Holding Ltd
- FG Next Holding SA
- Fundamenta Group Holding SA
- Fundamenta Group Holding AG
- Fundamenta Group Holding Ltd
- Fundamenta Group AG
- Fundamenta Group Ltd
- Fundamenta Group SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FG Next Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006102412, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
FG Next Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-115.007.135, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 01.07.2024, Publ. 1006071356).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Garcia Alvarez, David, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gätzi, Christian, von Quarten, in Steinhausen, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kuster, Daniel, von Winterthur, in Feusisberg, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marxer, Florian Wolfgang, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vaduz (LI), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gauch, Urs Peter, von Tafers, in Zug, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1006071356, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
FG Next Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-115.007.135, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 24.05.2024, Publ. 1006039003).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marxer, Florian Wolfgang, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vaduz (LI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Salzmann, Daniel Rudolf, von Luzern, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Felder, Peter, von Inwil, in Rothenburg, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Saraco, Giorgio, von Zürich, in Uitikon, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006039003, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Fundamenta Group Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-115.007.135, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 05.04.2024, Publ. 1006001853).
Statutenänderung:
16.05.2024.
Firma neu:
FG Next Holding AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(FG Next Holding SA) (FG Next Holding Ltd).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 20, 6300 Zug.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.