Address
c/o Jost Alban
Mattenstrasse 9
3988 Obergesteln
Reports for Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG
- Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG is active in the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Obergesteln.
- The management of the company Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG, which was founded on the 05.10.1981, consists of 6 persons.
- On the 07.09.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-104.023.064.
Management (6)
newest board members
Kilian Nellen,
Alban Philipp Jost,
Konrad Josef Jost,
Patrick Ruppen,
Konrad Hallenbarter
newest authorized signatories
Alban Philipp Jost,
Konrad Josef Jost,
Viktor Alexander Borter
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.10.1981
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Obergoms
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.000.178-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.023.064
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Tourismus in Obergesteln durch: Bau und Betrieb von Hotels, Chalets, Appartementhäusern und anderen Unterkunftsstätten für Touristen; Bau und Betrieb von Sportanlagen; Vermittlung von Immobilien. Kann Mobilien und Immobilien kaufen oder veräussern; Organisation, Planung; Entwicklung, Bau und Betrieb sämtlicher übriger touristischer Anlagen, Einrichtungen und Dienste, welche der Entwicklung des Tourismus förderlich sind; Beteiligung an Unternehmen mit ähnlicher Zielsetzung; Förderung der sozialen und wirtschaftlichen Entwicklung der Gemeinde Obergesteln unter Wahrung des Erwerbscharakters.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRAG Treuhand und Revisions AG | Naters | 19.04.2011 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bass Consulting AG | Naters | 26.11.2007 | 18.04.2011 | |
Treuhand Jentsch Oscar, dipl. Bücherexperte | Brig-Glis | <2004 | 25.11.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004973479, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG, in Obergoms, CHE-104.023.064, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2018, Publ. 4436811).
Domizil neu:
c/o Jost Alban, Mattenstrasse 9, 3988 Obergesteln.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nellen, Kilian, von Riederalp, in Ried-Brig, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4436811, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG, in Obergoms, CHE-104.023.064, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2017, Publ. 3767997).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Graf, Markus Josef, von Luterbach, in Feldbrunnen (Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Alban Philipp, von Obergoms, in Ulrichen (Obergoms), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Ulrichen (Obergoms), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jost, Konrad Josef, von Obergoms, in Obergesteln (Obergoms), Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ruppen, Patrick, von Naters, in Brig (Brig-Glis), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3767997, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2017, S. 0, publizierten TR-Eintrages Nr. 1118 vom 08.09.2017 Feriendorf Schlüsselacker AG, in Obergoms, CHE-104.023.064, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2017, Publ. 3750877).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jost, Konrad Josef, von Obergoms, in Obergesteln (Obergoms), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Reckingen VS (Goms), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.