Address
c/o ATU General Trust (Schweiz) AG
Wilfriedstrasse 7
8032 Zürich
Reports for FC Meinrat Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FC Meinrat Holding AG
- FC Meinrat Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of investment companies». The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- The company was founded on 23.11.2001.
- The last commercial register change was made on 31.10.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.396.414.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: ATU General Trust (Schweiz) AG, Jubiläumsstiftung der Lungenliga Zürich, Livalor Vermögensverwaltung AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.025.220-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.396.414
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten, die Verwaltung und das Veräussern von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmen, insbesondere bei Dienstleistungsgesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Loppacher Treuhand | Rümlang | 05.07.2011 | 30.10.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FC Meinrat Holding SA
- FC Meinrat Holding Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FC Meinrat Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005872522, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FC Meinrat Holding AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.396.414, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2023, Publ. 1005825431). Gemäss Erklärung vom 23.10.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loppacher Treuhand (CHE-107.507.594), in Rümlang, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005825431, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FC Meinrat Holding AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.396.414, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 56 vom 20.03.2020, Publ. 1004857038).
Domizil neu:
c/o ATU General Trust (Schweiz) AG, Wilfriedstrasse 7, 8032 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nesti, Peter, von Zürich, in Meilen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lehmann, Jürg, von Zürich, in Stäfa, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004857038, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FC Meinrat Holding AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.396.414, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2018, Publ. 1004524407).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nesti, Peter, von Zürich, in Meilen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Tos, Andrej, slowenischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ljubljana (SI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.