Reports for Familie Egger Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Familie Egger Holding AG
- Familie Egger Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Rapperswil SG, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The company was founded on 25.05.2005 and has 3 persons in its management.
- On the 07.03.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Familie Egger Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.373.626.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: CubeServ AG, Pilates2Physio by Lina Malec.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.05.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.057.361-9
UID/VAT
CHE-112.373.626
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, dauernde Verwaltung, Vermittlung und Verwertung von Beteiligungen und Vermögenswerten aller Art an anderen in- und ausländischen Unternehmen und Erbringung aller durch die Holding-Funktion bedingten Dienstleistungen, wie Koordination, Finanzierungs-, Beratungs- und Managementaufgaben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im in- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen, Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen sowie Wertschriften und gewerbliche Schutzrechte erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AWP AG für Wirtschaftsprüfung und Steuerberatung | Zug | 31.05.2005 | 23.06.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- DEFENTAS AG
- Magru Beratung AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Familie Egger Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005980104, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Familie Egger Holding AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-112.373.626, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2018, Publ. 1004513000).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bourcevet, Adrian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaltenbach, Doris, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Egg b. Zürich (Egg), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004513000, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Familie Egger Holding AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-112.373.626, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2017, Publ. 3859851).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egger, Norbert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schönau am Königssee (DE), Vizepräsident und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Egger-Walch, Anna-Elisabeth, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Schönau am Königssee (DE), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona)];
Bourcevet, Adrian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3859851, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Familie Egger Holding AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-112.373.626, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 21.05.2015, Publ. 2162963).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bourcevet, Adrian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.