Reports for evex AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout evex AG
- evex AG has its legal headquarters in Fällanden and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 03.07.2001.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 28.10.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.073.402.
- Armatron AG, Armatron Holding AG, art creative gmbh have the same address as evex AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.07.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fällanden
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.014.659-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.073.402
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Planung, Projektierung, Ausführung und Bauleitung für die Bereiche mechanische und mechatronische Schliesssysteme, Verschlusstechnik, Zutritts- und Zeiterfassungssysteme, Fluchtwegsysteme und deren Beschriftung und Beschilderung, sowie den Vertrieb von Metallbaufertigteilen. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt weiter die anschliessende Verwaltung solcher Anlagen, die Organisation der Anlagenadministration, sowie den Unterhalt dieser Anlagen im Support und Servicebereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen und deren Geschäftsführung und Verwaltung übernehmen sowie gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Immaterialgüterrechte und Know-how erwerben und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Freienbach | 28.10.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KMU Treuhand und Revisions AG | St. Gallen | 06.07.2004 | 27.10.2022 | |
HotRest Inventar AG | Dietikon | <2004 | 05.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- evex Inc
- evex Ltd
- evex SA
- EVEX AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: evex AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005592708, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
evex AG, in Fällanden, CHE-109.073.402, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2020, Publ. 1005012358).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KMU Treuhand und Revisions AG (CHE-359.187.322), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle;
Neyer, Jonny, von St. Gallen, in Dietlikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-115.937.583), in Freienbach, Revisionsstelle;
Altenbach, Pierre, von Schaffhausen, in Matzingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005012358, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
evex AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-109.073.402, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 24.02.2020, Publ. 1004836758).
Statutenänderung:
26.10.2020.
Sitz neu:
Fällanden.
Domizil neu:
Bruggacherstrasse 26, 8117 Fällanden.
Publication number: HR02-1004836758, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
evex AG, in Dübendorf, CHE-109.073.402, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 29.07.2019, Publ. 1004685722).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bühler, Thomas, von Büron, in Rapperswil-Jona, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.