Reports for Ettmüller Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ettmüller Immobilien AG
- Ettmüller Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Cham and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Ettmüller Immobilien AG, which was founded on the 14.05.1968, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.07.2024.
- In the commercial register the company Ettmüller Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-103.286.537.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.05.1968
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.000.886-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.286.537
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Erstellung und Verwaltung sowie Verkauf von Liegenschaften sowie Finanzierungen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Patente, Lizenzen und Wertschriften erwerben und veräussern
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Steuerberatung Josef Meier | Zug | 24.06.2005 | 22.09.2010 | |
Compaudit AG | Zug | <2004 | 23.06.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ettmüller Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089137, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ettmüller Immobilien AG, in Cham, CHE-103.286.537, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2017, Publ. 3677611).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ettmüller, Balz, von Zürich, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wintsch, Jörg, von Zürich, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Düring, Dr. Alex, von Luzern, in Oberägeri, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mühlemann, Andreas, von Seeberg und Zürich, in Gräslikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huwyler, Beat, von Bünzen, in Küssnacht (SZ), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3677611, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ettmüller Immobilien AG, in Cham, CHE-103.286.537, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2010, Publ. 5822962).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ettmüller, Balz, von Zürich, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zug].
Publication number: 5822962, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Ettmüller Immobilien AG, in Cham, CH-170.3.000.886-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 05.05.2009, S. 26, Publ. 5003264).
Statutenänderung:
13.09.2010.
Mitteilungen neu:
Alle Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen rechtsgültig durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die letztgemeldete Adresse der Aktionäre.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 16.08.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsbüro Josef Meier, in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.