Reports for Ethical Foods SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ethical Foods SA
- Ethical Foods SA with its legal headquarters in Tannay is active. Ethical Foods SA operates in the sector «Production of comestibles».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 14.05.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-139.755.423.
- Carambas Sàrl, Coaching pour le bien-être et la performance Sàrl, K & K Investments SA have the same address as Ethical Foods SA.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Henrik Svennas,
Marc Buehler,
Josef Spronz,
Yizhak Cole,
Per Nilson
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.04.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Tannay
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.148.346-6
UID/VAT
CHE-139.755.423
Sector
Production of comestibles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La production, la distribution et la commercialisation de produits alimentaires et de biens de consommation courante, sur le plan international; tous conseils et services en matière de distribution, de marketing et de commercialisation aux fabricants de produits alimentaires et de biens de consommation courante (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Verifid Révision SA | Genève | 19.07.2017 | 13.05.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ethical Foods SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005181727, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ethical Foods SA, à Tannay, CHE-139.755.423 (FOSC du 19.07.2017, p. 0/3654729). Statuts modifiés le 29.04.2021.
Nouveau capital-actions:
CHF 129'500, libéré à concurrence de CHF 129'500, divisé en 12'950 actions nominatives de CHF 10.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Svennas Henrik, de et à Versoix, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle. Verifid Révision SA (CHE-107.558.249) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 29.04.2021, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: 3654729, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ethical Foods SA, à Tannay, CHE-139.755.423 (FOSC du 20.06.2017, p. 0/3590549). Radiation de la mention relative à la renonciation à l'organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Verifid Révision SA (CHE-107.558.249), à Genève.
Publication number: 3590549, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ethical Foods SA, à Tannay, CHE-139.755.423 (FOSC du 17.02.2017, p. 0/3355915). Statuts modifiés le 9 juin 2017. Augmentation ordinaire du capital-actions.
Nouveau capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 129'500, divisé en 12'950 actions au porteur de CHF 10.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.