Reports for Equilas AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Equilas AG
- Equilas AG is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Bern.
- Equilas AG has 5 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 04.01.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-273.774.015.
- In the IPI there are 2 trademarks or applications registered by the company Equilas AG.
- On the same address as Equilas AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Bur AG, Levant Supermarkt Inh. Amir, Patio Plus AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marin Martinovic,
Nadine Greter,
Alain Brodbeck,
Alfredo Marcel Stettler,
Christoph Albrecht Würgler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.09.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.064.805-5
UID/VAT
CHE-273.774.015
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Dienstleistungszentrums in den Bereichen Verarbeitung und Rechnungswesen, Beratung, Legal & Compliance, Marketing, HRM/Personalwesen sowie Ausbildung, insbesondere für Finanzintermediäre, Unternehmungen im finanznahen Bereich, Finanz- und Beteiligungsgesellschaften, institutionelle Anleger, Kunden von Finanzintermediären sowie weiteren Unternehmen im nicht finanznahen Bereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke, Wertschriften, Patente und andere Schutzrechte erwerben, verwalten, vermieten, belasten oder weiterveräussern, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 25.09.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
11.01.2022 | active | 12886/2021 | |
EQUILAS | 11.01.2022 | active | 12884/2021 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Equilas AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005643559, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Equilas AG, in Bern, CHE-273.774.015, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 05.05.2021, Publ. 1005169477).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Greter, Nadine, von Greppen, in Münsingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Martinovic, Marin, von Ostermundigen, in Boll (Vechigen), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005169477, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Equilas AG, in Bern, CHE-273.774.015, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2020, Publ. 1004819053).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Künzli, Markus Stefan, von Dagmersellen, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004819053, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Equilas AG, in Bern, CHE-273.774.015, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2018, Publ. 1004527477).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brodbeck, Alain, von Münchenstein, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Stettler, Alfredo Marcel, von Eggiwil, in Thun, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.