Reports for Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil
- Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil in Tafers is a Body corporate from the sector «Underground lines and sewage treatment plants». Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil is active.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 09.03.2023.
- The company Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil is registered under the UID CHE-102.082.860.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: SensePlus GmbH, TerraLamprat GmbH, TerraLamprat Immo&Mobi GmbH.
Management (5)
Executive board
Gaston Anton Waeber,
Beat Gauch,
Ivo Hayoz,
Jakob Johann Dubi,
Philippe Berset
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1922
Legal form
Body corporate
Legal headquarters of the company
Tafers
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.630.014-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.082.860
Sector
Underground lines and sewage treatment plants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwässerung der in den Gemeinden Tafers und Düdingen um Landprat und Menziswil liegenden Moore.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Entwässerungskörperschaft von Tafers
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005696584, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil, in Tafers, CHE-102.082.860 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225828).
Vollständige Adresse:
Lampratweg 6, 1712 Tafers.
Verstorbene und gelöschte Personen:
Hayoz Hans, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Präsident, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Blanchard Paul, Verwaltungsratsmiglied, Vizepräsident, ohne Unterschrift;
Brülhart Marius, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Sekretär, Kassier, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gauch Paul, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, ohne Unterschrift;
Dubi Jakob, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, ohne Unterschrift.
Neu eingetragene Personen:
Gauch Beat, von und in Tafers, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Präsident, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Waeber Gaston Anton, von und in Tafers, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Vizepräsident, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Berset Philippe, von Villorsonnens, in Marly, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, Kassier, Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hayoz Ivo, von Fribourg, in Düdingen, Verwaltungsratsmitglied ohne Unterschrift;
Dubi Jakob Johann, von Burgistein, in Tafers, Verwaltungsratsmitglied, ohne Unterschrift.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil, in Tafers (SHAB Nr.112 vom 13.6.1989, S.2448). Hans Hayoz, Verwaltungsratspräsident, wohnt nun in Düdingen (und nicht in Freiburg).
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Entwässerungskörperschaft Landprat-Menziswil, in Tafers , Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr.73 vom 28.3.1979, S.970).
Aus dem VR (Verwaltungsrat) sind ausgeschieden:
Arnold Riedo, Sekretär und Kassier, und Max Aebischer, Präsident;
ihre Unterschriften sind erloschen. Hans Hayoz, von Düdingen und Freiburg, nun in Freiburg, bisher Mitglied, ist nun Präsident.
Neu wurde in den VR ernannt:
Marius Brülhart, von St. Silvester und Freiburg, in Freiburg, Sekretär und Kassier. Die Unterschrift führen der Präsident und der Sekretär kollektiv zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.