Reports for Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl
- Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Delémont, is active and operates in the sector «Warehousing and logistics».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 25.09.2019.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-115.987.463.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Entrepôts de Bellerive Delémont SA, TAXI D'Andrea Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.09.2010
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Delémont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.4.005.311-6
UID/VAT
CHE-115.987.463
Sector
Warehousing and logistics
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce d'articles de toutes sortes, services logistiques ainsi que stockage (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004724047, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl, à Delémont, CHE-115.987.463, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 141 du 24.07.2017, Publ. 3662767).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Bellerive 7, 2800 Delémont.
Publication number: 3662767, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl, à Delémont, CHE-115.987.463, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 181 du 17.09.2010, Publ. 5816722).
Modification des statuts:
27.06.2017.
Nouveau capital social:
CHF 200'000.00 [précédemment: CHF 50'000.00].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Viefers, Lieselotte, de Bâle, à Basel, associée, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 500.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Viefers, Markus, de Basel, à Basel, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 52 parts sociales de CHF 500.00 [précédemment: de Bâle, pour 30 parts sociales de CHF 500.00];
Tschudin, Dominik Beat, de Basel et Waldenburg, à Basel, associé, avec signature collective à deux, pour 50 parts sociales de CHF 500.00;
Tschudin-Viefers, Ursula Elisabeth, de Basel et Waldenburg, à Basel, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 22 parts sociales de CHF 500.00;
Entrepôts de Bellerive Delémont SA (CHE-108.112.809), à Delémont, associée, pour 272 parts sociales de CHF 500.00.
Publication number: 5816722, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Entrepôts de Bellerive Logistique Sàrl, à Delémont, CH-670.4.005.311-6, Bellerive 7, 2805 Soyhières, nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Date des statuts:
7.09.2010.
But:
Commerce d'articles de toutes sortes, services logistiques ainsi que stockage (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital social:
CHF 50'000.--.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit, fax ou courriel. Selon déclaration du gérant du 07.09.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Personnes inscrites:
Viefers, Markus, de Bâle, à Bâle, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 30 parts sociales de CHF 500.--;
Viefers, Lieselotte, de Bâle, à Bâle, associée, avec signature collective à deux, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 500.--;
Viefers, Michael, de Bâle, à Bâle, associé, avec signature collective à deux, pour 4 parts sociales de CHF 500.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.