Branches (2)
Reports for Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen
- Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen has its legal headquarters in Solothurn and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 12.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-107.547.174.
- On the same address there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Emch+Berger AG Solothurn, MOWA Healthcare AG, orthopunkt ag.
Management (7)
newest board members
Gabriella Flückiger-Lilla,
Stephan Peter Wüthrich,
Dominik Cantaluppi
newest authorized signatories
Gabriella Flückiger-Lilla,
Stephan Peter Wüthrich,
Veronica Amorosi,
Nicolas Schaub,
Nicolas Schenk
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Solothurn
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.914.784-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.547.174
CHE-116.310.441 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen auf dem Gebiet des Ingenieurwesens. Kann alle anderen Geschäfte eingehen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 12.12.2012 | 10.04.2019 | |
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 04.02.2010 | 11.12.2012 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | <2004 | 03.02.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Emch + Berger AG Vermessungen
- Keller Arpentages SA
- Keller Ingenieure AG
- Keller Ingenieure AG, Winterthur
- Keller Vermessungen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006083000, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen, in Solothurn, CHE-107.547.174, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 11.03.2022, Publ. 1005425144).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneider, Urs, von Rüthi (SG), in Rüthi (SG), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Affolter, Beat, von Lyss, in Rüttenen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Guillod, Pascal, von Bas-Vully, in Langendorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flückiger, Gabriella, von Münchenbuchsee, in Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wüthrich, Stephan, von Trub, in Kirchlindach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005425144, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen, in Solothurn, CHE-107.547.174, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 17.04.2019, Publ. 1004612718).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Manfred, von Günsberg, in Günsberg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amorosi, Veronica, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Derendingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Arber, Andreas, von Oftringen, in Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Solothurn].
Publication number: HR02-1004612718, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Emch+Berger AG Vermessungen, in Solothurn, CHE-107.547.174, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 11.04.2019, Publ. 1004608471).
Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Folgende Zweigniederlassung ist aufgehoben worden:] [gestrichen: Zofingen (CH-400.9.031.811-4)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.