Head office
Other branches (2)
Reports for Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen
- Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen is currently active and the industry «Other construction». The legal headquarters are in Baden.
- Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen was founded on 18.12.1998.
- On the 13.12.2011 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen is registered under the UID CHE-293.465.669.
- Bayford AG, Einklang Mensch Hund Jasmin Balmer, Frei Heizung + Sanitär GmbH have the same address as Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen.
Management (1)
For the supreme institution of the company, please look at the head office
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.1998
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Baden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.9.020.096-5
UID/VAT
CHE-293.465.669
CHE-105.860.306 VAT
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Elektr. Star,- u. Schwachstrominstallationen usw
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6456030, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen, in Baden, CH-400.9.020.096-5, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 24.12.1998, S. 8814).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Wettingen.
Domizil neu:
Neuenhoferstrasse 101, 5400 Baden.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CHE-105.860.306[CH-400.3.001.588-4].
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichenes Eintragsdatum am Hauptsitz aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [bisher: Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz: 25.02.1975].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kuhn, Robert, von Bünzen, in Wettingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kuhn, Monika, von Bünzen, in Wettingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen, in Baden, Bruggerstrasse 37, 5400 Baden, Zweigniederlassung (Neueintragung).
Firma Hauptsitz:
Elinag Elektroinstallationen Kommunikationsanlagen.
Rechtsnatur Hauptsitz:
Aktiengesellschaft.
Hauptsitz:
Wettingen.
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
25.02.1975 [letzte Publikation am Hauptsitz: SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.1998, S. 8621].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
Ausführung von elektrischen Stark- und Schwachstrominstallationen, Beteiligung an, Erwerb und Errichtung von gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmungen.
Eingetragene Personen:
Kuhn, Robert, von Bünzen, in Wettingen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kuhn, Monika, von Bünzen, in Wettingen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Angst, Beat, von Lengnau AG, in Neuenhof, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.