Address
c/o Markus Wey
Im Hasliacher 6
5626 Hermetschwil-Staffeln
Reports for Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln
- Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln has its legal headquarters in Hermetschwil-Staffeln, is active and operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities».
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 26.04.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-102.266.791.
- On the same address as Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: wey & burkard inspektionsstelle GmbH, wey&burkard elektroberatung AG.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Michael Keusch,
Erich Stöckli,
Daniel Kupper,
Markus Scheidegger,
Markus Alfons Wey
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.02.1973
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Bremgarten (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.5.000.627-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.266.791
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft plant, erstellt und betreibt kommunale Infrastrukturen und erbringt Dienstleistungen im Bereich Energie und Kommunikation mit Schwergewicht im Ortsteil Hermetschwil-Staffeln und wird nach dem Grundsatz der Eigenwirtschaftlichkeit betrieben, ferner plant, erstellt und betreibt sie im Auftrag der Stadt Bremgarten die öffentliche Beleuchtung im Ortsteil Hermetschwil-Staffeln.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
db Treuhand AG | Zug | 26.04.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Elektra Hermetschwil - Staffeln
- Elektra Hermetschwil-Staffeln
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005732681, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln, in Bremgarten (AG), CHE-102.266.791, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 01.07.2022, Publ. 1005510248). [Der Verzicht auf die eingeschränkte Revision (opting-out) wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Vorstandes vom 03.03.2009 untersteht die Genossenschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
DB Treuhand AG (CHE-107.484.941), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005510248, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln, in Bremgarten (AG), CHE-102.266.791, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 17.07.2020, Publ. 1004939796).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Abbt, Konrad, von Bremgarten AG, in Bremgarten AG, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keusch, Michael, von Boswil, in Bremgarten (AG), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004939796, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Elektrizitätsgenossenschaft Hermetschwil-Staffeln, in Bremgarten (AG), CHE-102.266.791, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2016, Publ. 2899917).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eisenhut, Urs, von Gais, in Bremgarten AG, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stöckli, Erich, von Bremgarten (AG), in Bremgarten (AG), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kupper, Daniel, von Zufikon, in Bremgarten (AG), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.