Branches (2)
Reports for ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA
- ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA with its legal headquarters in Sion is active. ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The management of the company ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 01.11.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.027.828.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jacques Robert Rey,
Yves Savioz,
Walter Kurzen,
Stéphane Meyer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.01.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.005.153-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.027.828
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Travaux d'installations électriques, en courant fort et faible (lumières, forces, chaleur, télécommunications), établissement de lignes aériennes et de câbles pour courant fort et faible, exécution de tous travaux en relation directe ou indirecte avec l'énergie électrique
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ECSA Fiduciaire SA | Sion | 11.02.1999 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005595175, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA, à Sion, CHE-105.027.828, société anonyme (No. FOSC 232 du 29.11.2016, p.0, Publ. 3190795).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Savioz, Yves, de Saxon, à Saxon, secrétaire , directeur général, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire et directeur, avec signature collective à deux];
Rey, Jacky, de Ayent, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur et vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux];
Kurzen, Walter, de Frutigen, à Saxon, directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur.
Publication number: 3190795, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA, à Sion, CHE-105.027.828, société anonyme (No. FOSC 238 du 07.12.2004, p. 20, Publ. 2576334).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue des Ronquoz 18, 1950 Sion.
Nouvelle succursale:
Vétroz (CHE-345.202.754).
Publication number: 2576334, Commercial Registry Office Valais
ELECTRICITE SEDUNOISE SA, à Sion, CH-626.3.005.153-5, travaux d'installations électriques, société anonyme (FOSC no 116 du 19.06.2002, p. 17, publ. 517004).
Personne et signature radiée:
Gavin, André, de Forel (Lavaux) et Moudon, à Conthey, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Rey, Jacky, de Ayent, à Sion, administrateur et vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: sans fonction inscrite, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur];
Savioz, Yves, de Saxon, à Saxon, secrétaire et directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: sans fonction inscrite, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.