Address
c/o Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner
Lehnplatz 9
6460 Altdorf UR
Reports for Efor SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Efor SA
- Efor SA has its legal headquarters in Altdorf UR and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Efor SA consists of 3 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 12.10.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of UR under the UID CHE-100.816.893.
- Companies with an identical address: Ballena AG, Bergfuchs AG, Cabbani Home Concept AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.03.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Altdorf (UR)
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-645.1.002.106-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.816.893
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt hauptsächlich den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Immobilien im Ausland. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt es auch, Beratungsleistungen zu erbringen und alle Geschäftsbetriebe und Finanztransaktionen durchzuführen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Muller Christe & Associés SA | Neuchâtel | <2004 | 15.10.2015 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Efor SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005858881, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Efor SA, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-100.816.893, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 08.07.2019, Publ. 1004669937).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Voirol, Roger Léon Paul, von Les Genevez (JU), in Milvignes, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Voirol, Sébastien Alan, von Les Genevez (JU), in Erlach, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Gampelen];
Stauffer, Mélanie, von Röthenbach im Emmental, in Cortaillod, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004669937, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Efor SA, bisher in Neuchâtel, CHE-100.816.893, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2430707 vom 16.10.2015, Publ. 2430707).
Statutenänderung:
27.06.2019.
Sitz neu:
Altdorf (UR).
Domizil neu:
c/o Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner, Lehnplatz 9, 6460 Altdorf UR.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt hauptsächlich den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Immobilien im Ausland. Die Gesellschaft bezweckt es auch, Beratungsleistungen zu erbringen und alle Geschäftsbetriebe und Finanztransaktionen durchzuführen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Publication number: HR02-1004670624, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Efor SA , à Neuchâtel, CHE-100.816.893 (FOSC du 16.10.2015, p. 0/2430707). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Altdorf (UR), la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du canton de Uri. Par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre du commerce de Neuchâtel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.