Reports for ebcom ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ebcom ag
- ebcom ag has its legal headquarters in Reinach AG and is active. It operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management of the company ebcom ag consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 14.05.1998.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.08.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-104.350.818.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Stephan Elmiger,
Ilija Karadzic,
Jan Zegg,
Nadine Séverine Herzog-Terribilini,
Frank Willi Grundler
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.05.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.019.452-5
UID/VAT
CHE-104.350.818
CHE-386.910.995 VAT
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Informatikdienstleistungen insbesondere in den Bereichen Systemtechnik und Applikationsentwicklung, Betrieb, Unterhalt, Erneuerung und Erweiterung von Rechenzentren in der Schweiz, Sicherstellung eines Helpdesks, Vertrieb von Hardware, Software und Lizenzen, Planung, Ausführung sowie Service und Elektroinstallationen insbesondere in den Bereichen Netzwerk und Telematik, Gründung und Aufbau, Erwerb, Ausbau, Verwaltung, Finanzierung sowie Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen bzw. Niederlassungen, Erwerb, Aufbau, Verwaltung, Finanzierung sowie Veräusserung von bzw. der Vermögensanlagen, Erstellung, Erwerb, Verwaltung, Vermietung, Finanzierung, Unterhalt, Reparatur, Erneuerung, Rückbau sowie Veräusserung von bzw. der Immobilienanlagen (Projekte, Grundstücke sowie Liegenschaften).
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gebag Treuhand AG | Lenzburg | <2004 | 08.01.2017 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ebcom ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006099979, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ebcom ag, in Reinach (AG), CHE-104.350.818, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2024, Publ. 1005944176).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bryner, Angela, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Aarau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herzog-Terribilini, Nadine, von Onsernone, in Lostorf, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005944176, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ebcom ag, in Reinach (AG), CHE-104.350.818, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2023, Publ. 1005843870).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bruderer, Erich, von Trogen, in Menziken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rötheli, Silvan, von Hägendorf, in Lostorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bryner, Angela, von Möriken-Wildegg, in Aarau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Elmiger, Stephan, von Hochdorf, in Buchs (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005843870, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
ebcom ag, in Reinach (AG), CHE-104.350.818, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2023, Publ. 1005726445).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spielmann, Werner, von Obergösgen, in Lostorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.