Reports for Doubat S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Doubat S.A.
- Doubat S.A. in St-Ursanne is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Doubat S.A. is active.
- Doubat S.A. has 6 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.02.2019.
- The company is registered in the commercial register JU under the UID CHE-101.076.124.
Management (6)
newest board members
Vincent Erwin Joseph Seuret,
Jean-Luc Marc Plumey,
Raymond Paul Bernard Huguelet,
Jean-Maurice Ernest Henri Maître,
Gérard Beuchat
newest authorized signatories
Vincent Erwin Joseph Seuret,
Jean-Luc Marc Plumey,
Raymond Paul Bernard Huguelet,
Jean-Maurice Ernest Henri Maître,
Gérard Beuchat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.05.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Clos du Doubs
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.001.698-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.076.124
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'élaboration de projets, la recherche d'acquéreurs et la réalisation de projets immobiliers dans le Clos du Doubs en particulier. Elle peut acquérir et vendre des immeubles. Elle peut accomplir toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à atteindre son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement ainsi qu'acquérir d'autres entreprises ou y participer.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GNG REVISION Sàrl | Porrentruy | 03.12.2009 | 21.02.2019 | |
Ernst & Young SA | Neuchâtel | <2004 | 02.12.2009 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Doubat S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004573406, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Doubat S.A., à Clos du Doubs, CHE-101.076.124, société anonyme (No. FOSC 13 du 21.01.2019, Publ. 1004547130). Selon déclaration du 01.02.2019, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
RéviAjoie Sàrl, à Porrentruy (CH-670.4.004.203-6), organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004547130, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Doubat S.A., à Clos du Doubs, CHE-101.076.124, société anonyme (No. FOSC 176 du 11.09.2015, Publ. 2369525).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Buchs, Patrice Marcel Alain, de Jaun, à Porrentruy, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Seuret, Vincent Erwin Joseph, de Courrendlin, à Bassecourt (Haute-Sorne), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2369525, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Doubat S.A., à Clos du Doubs, CHE-101.076.124, société anonyme (No. FOSC 239 du 10.12.2013, Publ. 1227737).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Plumey, Jean-Luc Marc, de Grandfontaine, à Porrentruy, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Buchs, Patrice Marcel Alain, de Jaun, à Porrentruy, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.