Reports for Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG
- Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG from Glattbrugg operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is active.
- Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- On the 26.05.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-192.570.702.
Management (3)
newest board members
Oliver Horst Kschieschow,
Annette Schmalisch-Stam,
Björn Achstaller
newest authorized signatories
Oliver Horst Kschieschow,
Annette Schmalisch-Stam,
Björn Achstaller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.10.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.039.721-0
UID/VAT
CHE-192.570.702
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung, den Betrieb, das Marketing und den Vertrieb von Hotels, Restaurants und artverwandten Betrieben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alpina Treuhand AG | Hergiswil (NW) | 17.12.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Basel | 20.03.2018 | 16.12.2019 | |
Ostschweizerische Treuhand Zürich AG | Zürich | 04.10.2013 | 19.03.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004896350, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2019 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 27482 vom 12.07.2019 Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG, in Opfikon, CHE-192.570.702, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 17.12.2019, Publ. 1004784760).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmalisch-Stam, Annette, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Schmalisch-Stamm, Annette].
Publication number: HR02-1004784760, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG, in Opfikon, CHE-192.570.702, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2019, Publ. 1004677478).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
HB&P Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-103.547.436), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Alpina Treuhand AG (CHE-106.904.389), in Hergiswil (NW), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004677478, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dorint Hotel am Flughafen Zürich AG, in Opfikon, CHE-192.570.702, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2018, Publ. 1004487290).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stauffacher, Matthias, von Glarus Süd, in Erlenbach ZH, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Böckeler, Jörg Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Köln (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pawlizki, Karl-Heinz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Peters, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Mönchengladbach (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Herter, Rolf, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kschieschow, Oliver Horst, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kriens, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Achstaller, Björn, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Grenzach-Wyhlen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schmalisch-Stamm, Annette, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.