Reports for DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA
- DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA has its legal headquarters in Sion, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.01.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-108.712.286.
- Companies with the same address as DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA: MAISON GILLIARD SA, RR-at2direction travaux Sàrl.
Management (7)
newest board members
Philippe Jean-Jacques Schuler,
David Genolet,
Patrick Michael Z'Brun,
Vincent André Claivaz,
Jakob Josef Schuler-Bolfing
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Jean-Jacques Schuler,
Emery Nicolas,
David Genolet,
Patrick Michael Z'Brun,
Vincent André Claivaz
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1953
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.000.746-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.712.286
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation, achat, vente de tous domaines viticoles ou agricoles, conservation, vente, transformation de tous produits récoltés sur le domaine, notamment en nature de vins, légumes, fruits et toutes opérations s'y rattachant.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 23.01.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Sion | 13.07.2007 | 22.01.2023 | |
SCF Révision SA | Sion | <2004 | 12.07.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Les Domaines de Robert Gilliard SA
- Gilliard-Juat & Cie SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005659366, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA, à Sion, CHE-108.712.286, société anonyme (No. FOSC 96 du 18.05.2022, Publ. 1005477079).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA (CH-626.9.004.421-2), à Sion, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Schuler, Philippe Jean-Jacques, de Schwyz, à Bern, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005477079, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA, à Sion, CHE-108.712.286, société anonyme (No. FOSC 216 du 05.11.2020, Publ. 1005016300).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bagnoud, Léonard Jérôme, de Chermignon, à Isérables, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Nicolas, Emery, de Lens, à Sion, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005016300, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
DOMAINES MAISON GILLIARD SA, à Sion, CHE-108.712.286, société anonyme (No. FOSC 47 du 09.03.2020, Publ. 1004848078).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Pfenninger, Hans Ulrich, de Stäfa, à Veyras, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Genolet, David, de Hérémence, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Z'Brun, Patrick Michael, de Turtmann-Unterems, à Salgesch, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.