Reports for DNV Consulting GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DNV Consulting GmbH
- DNV Consulting GmbH is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Wetzikon ZH.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 29.04.2011.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 15.02.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-399.258.939.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Andersson Capital Investment GmbH, CARLEX Export Switzerland GmbH, PHOS4HOUSE AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.04.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Wetzikon (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.044.932-4
UID/VAT
CHE-399.258.939
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Unternehmen und Organisationen in strategischer, operativer, organisatorischer und in finanzieller Hinsicht sowie die Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DNV Consulting GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005100206, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DNV Consulting GmbH, in Wetzikon (ZH), CHE-399.258.939, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 23.02.2018, Publ. 4074005).
Domizil neu:
Poststrasse 9, 8620 Wetzikon ZH.
Publication number: 4074005, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DNV Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-399.258.939, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2017, Publ. 3351719).
Statutenänderung:
16.02.2018.
Sitz neu:
Wetzikon (ZH).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 15, 8620 Wetzikon ZH.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Tanja, von Merenschwand, in Neerach, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Delgado Vicente, Nelson, portugiesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3351719, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
DNV Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-399.258.939, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2013, Publ. 1181967).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Delgado Vicente, Nelson, portugiesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Vicente, Nelson Delgado, in Linda-a-Velha (PT), Gesellschafter ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].