Reports for Dionysius Photography GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dionysius Photography GmbH
- Dionysius Photography GmbH is currently active and the industry «Photography, Operation of photo labs». The legal headquarters are in Lachen SZ.
- The management of the company Dionysius Photography GmbH, which was founded on the 14.06.2019, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 19.10.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-398.843.839.
- On the same address as Dionysius Photography GmbH there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: Adlac Immobilien GmbH, Adlac Treuhand GmbH, IBI Trading & Consulting AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.06.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lachen
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.026.887-9
UID/VAT
CHE-398.843.839
Sector
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft erbringt sämtliche Dienstleistungen sowie Handel mit Produkten in den Bereichen Fotografie und Film. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Immaterialgüterrechte, Grundstücke sowie Wertschriften erwerben, halten, verwalten, belasten, verwerten und veräussern. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet sind den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dionysius Photography GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005586362, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Dionysius Photography GmbH, in Lachen, CHE-398.843.839, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2019, Publ. 1004654580).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schütz, Jeannine, von Wangen (SZ), in Lachen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hungerbühler, Dioni, von Sommeri, in Wangen (SZ), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR01-1004654580, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Dionysius Photography GmbH, in Lachen, CHE-398.843.839, Mosenbachstrasse 2, 8853 Lachen SZ, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.06.2019.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft erbringt sämtliche Dienstleistungen sowie Handel mit Produkten in den Bereichen Fotografie und Film. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Immaterialgüterrechte, Grundstücke sowie Wertschriften erwerben, halten, verwalten, belasten, verwerten und veräussern. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet sind den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung vom 13.06.2019 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schütz, Jeannine, von Wangen (SZ), in Lachen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.