Reports for Dierke Houben AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dierke Houben AG
- Dierke Houben AG from Engelberg operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The management of the company Dierke Houben AG, which was founded on the 14.10.2003, consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.12.2008.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.258.569.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Javanir Holding AG, SiTrax Bau AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Engelberg
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.027.106-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.258.569
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Unternehmen in den Schwerpunkten Veränderungsmanagement und Führungskräfte-Coaching. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, Immobilien und Grundstücke sowie immaterielle Güter und andere Kapitalanlagen erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann ausserdem alle kommerziellen, finanzielle und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AHW Beratung & Revision AG in Liquidation | Zürich | <2004 | 21.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Dierke Houben Ltd
- Dierke Houben SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dierke Houben AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4793998, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Dierke Houben AG, in Engelberg, CH-020.3.027.106-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2008, S. 16, Publ. 4267588).
Statutenänderung:
1.12.2008. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 01.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Nicht publikationspflichtige Statutenänderungen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
AHW Beratung & Revision AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4294172, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Dierke Houben AG, in Zollikon, CH-020.3.027.106-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2004, S. 23, Publ. 2573848). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Engelberg (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2008, S. 16) im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 4267588, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Dierke Houben AG(Dierke Houben SA) (Dierke Houben Ltd), bisher in Zollikon, CH-020.3.027.106-5, Beratung von Unternehmen in Veränderungsmanagement, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2004, S. 23, Publ. 2573848).
Statutenänderung:
10.12.2007.
Sitz neu:
Engelberg.
Domizil neu:
am Dürrbach 5, 6391 Engelberg.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung von Unternehmen in den Schwerpunkten Veränderungsmanagement und Führungskräfte-Coaching. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, Immobilien und Grundstücke sowie immaterielle Güter und andere Kapitalanlagen erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann ausserdem alle kommerziellen, finanzielle und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Aktien:
10'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dierke, Dr. Kai Walter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zollikon, Präsident und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [wie bisher];
Houben, Dr. Anke, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zollikon, Mitglied und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [wie bisher];
AHW Beratung & Revision AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [wie bisher].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.