Reports for DER rollende Maler GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DER rollende Maler GmbH
- DER rollende Maler GmbH with its legal headquarters in Fislisbach is active. DER rollende Maler GmbH operates in the sector «Painter».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.04.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-146.096.086.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.02.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Fislisbach
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.442.278-6
UID/VAT
CHE-146.096.086
Sector
Painter
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Malerbetrieben, zudem Handel mit Waren aller Art; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- DER rollende Maler S.à.r.l.
- DER rollende Maler Ltd liab. Co
- DER rollende Maler S.a.g.l.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DER rollende Maler GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005718167, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DER rollende Maler GmbH, in Fislisbach, CHE-146.096.086, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2017, Publ. 3587775).
Domizil neu:
Schönbühlstrasse 40, 5442 Fislisbach.
Publication number: 3587775, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DER rollende Maler GmbH, in Fislisbach, CHE-146.096.086, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2017, Publ. 3346403).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Luggen, Benjamin, von Termen, in Brunegg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suhner, Remo, von Urnäsch, in Fislisbach, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 3346403, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
DER rollende Maler GmbH(DER rollende Maler S.à.r.l.) (DER rollende Maler S.a.g.l.) (DER rollende Maler Ltd liab. Co), in Fislisbach, CHE-146.096.086, Leemattenweg 14, 5442 Fislisbach, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
02.02.2017.
Zweck:
Betrieb von Malerbetrieben, zudem Handel mit Waren aller Art;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 02.02.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Luggen, Benjamin, von Termen, in Brunegg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Suhner, Remo, von Urnäsch, in Fislisbach, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.