Reports for Depot 195 AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Depot 195 AG
- Depot 195 AG with its legal headquarters in Winterthur is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». Depot 195 AG is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 07.02.2013.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 21.12.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-445.992.223.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christian Luis Rüegg,
Rebekka Reindl,
David Berger,
Alexander Ulrich,
Barbara Elspeth Bühler Abounacer
newest authorized signatories
Christian Luis Rüegg,
Rebekka Reindl,
David Berger,
Alexander Ulrich,
Barbara Elspeth Bühler Abounacer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.038.831-5
UID/VAT
CHE-445.992.223
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Führen eines Gastronomie- und/oder Beherberbungsbetriebes (Backpacker/Hostel) und Erbringung dazugehöriger Dienstleistungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten. Sie kann sich an anderen in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen der gleichen oder verwandten Branche beteiligen sowie gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
hit Treuhand GmbH | Uster | 12.02.2013 | 09.01.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Depot 195 AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005633901, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Depot 195 AG, in Winterthur, CHE-445.992.223, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2020, Publ. 1004800741).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gerber, Markus, von Heimiswil, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reindl, Rebekka, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüegg, Christian, von Eschenbach (SG), in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004800741, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Depot 195 AG, in Winterthur, CHE-445.992.223, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2013, S.0, Publ. 7060758). Gemäss Erklärung vom 20.12.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
hit Treuhand GmbH (CH-020.4.000.544-0), in Uster, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 7060758, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Depot 195 AG, in Winterthur, CH-020.3.038.831-5, Lagerplatz 4, 8400 Winterthur, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
01.02.2013.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Führen eines Gastronomie- und/oder Beherberbungsbetriebes (Backpacker/Hostel) und Erbringung dazugehöriger Dienstleistungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten. Sie kann sich an anderen in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen der gleichen oder verwandten Branche beteiligen sowie gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 325'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 325'000.00.
Aktien:
650 Namenaktien zu CHF 500.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Berger, David, von Oberlangenegg, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bühler Abounacer, Barbara Elspeth, von Himmelried, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber, Markus, von Heimiswil, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ulrich, Alexander, von Unterstammheim, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
hit Treuhand GmbH (CH-020.4.000.544-0), in Uster, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.