Reports for Deligno AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Deligno AG
- Deligno AG has its legal headquarters in Zollbrück and is active. It operates in the sector «Wood processing».
- Deligno AG was founded on 15.01.1929.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 09.05.2022.
- In the commercial register the company Deligno AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.780.921.
- The company Deligno AG has currently registered 2 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
Management (8)
newest board members
Ramon Beat Werner,
Monika Ursula Friedli-Walser,
Daniel Sieber,
Konrad Duttwiler
newest authorized signatories
Adrian Kämpfer,
Valentin Ladner,
Ramon Beat Werner,
Monika Ursula Friedli-Walser,
Hans Bühler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.01.1929
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rüderswil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.007.289-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.780.921
CHE-225.845.090 VAT
Sector
Wood processing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Sägerei, eines Hobel- und eines Oberflächentechnikwerkes, jegliche Bearbeitung von Holz und den Handel mit Holz- und Hobelwaren sowie mit anverwandten Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich auf verwandten Gebieten betätigen, gleichartige oder ähnliche Unternehmen übernehmen, vertreten, veräussern oder sich an solchen beteiligen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften oder Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | 20.08.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | <2004 | 19.08.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- De Ligno AG
- Brand Reber AG
- Fritz Brand AG
- Brand Fritz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
PRANA | 09.03.2022 | active | 03030/2022 |
CROCO | 08.03.2022 | active | 03028/2022 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Deligno AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005468446, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Deligno AG, in Rüderswil, CHE-101.780.921, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 30.06.2021, Publ. 1005233433).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stettler, Rudolf, von Eggiwil, in Thierachern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005233433, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
De Ligno AG, in Rüderswil, CHE-101.780.921, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 22.04.2020, Publ. 1004875005).
Statutenänderung:
06.05.2021.
Firma neu:
Deligno AG.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.