Address
Grubenstrasse 36
3322 Urtenen-Schönbühl
Reports for DAWA Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DAWA Immobilien AG
- DAWA Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Urtenen-Schönbühl and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- DAWA Immobilien AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- On the 12.01.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-435.154.315.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.12.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Urtenen-Schönbühl
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.052.543-0
UID/VAT
CHE-435.154.315
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Bewirtschaftung, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Immobilien in der Schweiz und im Ausland sowie den Handel mit Waren aller Art und die Erbringung von weiteren Dienstleistungen im Bereich des Hauptzwecks. Die Gesellschaft kann verwandte Geschäftszweige aufnehmen, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen bzw. Unternehmungen übernehmen und verkaufen oder solche begründen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und im Übrigen alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 19.12.2011 | 26.06.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DAWA Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005650423, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DAWA Immobilien AG, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, CHE-435.154.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2017, Publ. 3788343).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dautel, Ingo, von Jegenstorf, in Jegenstorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Waldner, Tobias, von Basel, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3788343, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DAWA Immobilien AG, in Jegenstorf, CHE-435.154.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 10.05.2017, Publ. 3512805).
Statutenänderung:
18.09.2017.
Sitz neu:
Urtenen-Schönbühl.
Domizil neu:
Grubenstrasse 36, 3322 Urtenen-Schönbühl.
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: c/o WALDNER ABO, Grubenstrasse 36, 3322 Urtenen-Schönbühl].
Publication number: 3512805, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DAWA Immobilien AG, in Jegenstorf, CHE-435.154.315, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2016, Publ. 2913729).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dautel, Ingo, von Jegenstorf, in Jegenstorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Etzweiler, Ulrich, von Untereggen, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.