Reports for DANIEL MOLL GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DANIEL MOLL GmbH
- DANIEL MOLL GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Scuol. DANIEL MOLL GmbH belongs to the industry «Production and processing of wooden goods» and is currently active.
- The management of the company DANIEL MOLL GmbH, which was founded on the 17.04.2015, consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.01.2022.
- The company's UID is CHE-194.571.888.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.04.2015
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Scuol
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.4.004.129-5
UID/VAT
CHE-194.571.888
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Schreinerei zur Projektierung/Planung und Herstellung/Ausführung von Möbeln, von Innenausbauten, Treppenbau, Umbauten, Reparaturen und historischen Restaurationen an Möbeln und Bauten, sowie den Handel von branchenüblichen Produkten und Antiquitäten jeder Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DANIEL MOLL GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005380215, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
DANIEL MOLL GmbH, in Scuol, CHE-194.571.888, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 22.04.2015, S.0, Publ. 2111169).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Moll, Daniel, von Lostorf, in Scuol, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Moll-Beck, Petra, von Lostorf, in Scuol, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, ].
Publication number: 2111169, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
DANIEL MOLL GmbH, in Scuol, CHE-194.571.888, Sotchà Dadora 259, 7550 Scuol, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
15.04.2015.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Schreinerei zur Projektierung/Planung und Herstellung/Ausführung von Möbeln, von Innenausbauten, Treppenbau, Umbauten, Reparaturen und historischen Restaurationen an Möbeln und Bauten, sowie den Handel von branchenüblichen Produkten und Antiquitäten jeder Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des nicht im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Daniel Moll, in Scuol, gemäss Vertrag vom 02.04.2015 und Übernahmebilanz per 31.12.2014 mit Aktiven von CHF 196'575.62 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 50'204.80, wofür 20 Stammanteile zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben und CHF 126'370.82 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich, per Brief, Telefax oder Email. Gemäss Erklärung vom 15.04.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Moll, Daniel, von Lostorf, in Scuol, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Moll-Beck, Petra, von Lostorf, in Scuol, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.