Reports for Cultira SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cultira SA
- Cultira SA is currently active and the industry «Gardening and landscaping». The legal headquarters are in Ilanz.
- The company was founded on 04.03.1991.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 20.01.2009. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Cultira SA is registered in the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-102.576.731.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.03.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ilanz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.001.794-5
UID/VAT
CHE-102.576.731
Sector
Gardening and landscaping
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung und Unterhalt von Umgebungs- und Gartenarbeiten aller Art, Aufforstungsarbeiten, Handel, Erschliessung und Überbauung von Liegenschaften sowie Beteiligung an anderen Unternehmen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand-kanzlei ag | Ilanz/Glion | <2004 | 19.01.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cultira SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4834008, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Cultira SA, in Ilanz, CH-350.3.001.794-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 26.03.1999, S. 2002).
Statutenänderung:
26.11.2008.
Mitteilungen:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 26.11.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bearth & Derungs Treuhand AG, in Ilanz, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Cultira SA, in I l a n z, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 04.09.1997, S. 6523).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dermont, Meinrad, von Rueun, in Ilanz, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Berger, Werner, von Fahrni, in Waltensburg/Vuorz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfister, Thomas, von Waltensburg/Vuorz , in Laax, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Cultira SA, in Ilanz, Umgebungs- und Gartenarbeiten aller Art usw. Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr.59 vom 25.03.1996, S.1695).
Statutenänderung:
20.08.1997.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF120'000.¬ [bisher: CHF60'000.¬].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF60'000.¬.
Aktien neu:
60 Namenaktien zu CHF2'000.¬ [bisher: 60 Namenaktien zu CHF1000.¬].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Weitere Änderungen der Statuten betreffen keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.