Branches (1)
Reports for Creative Foto AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Creative Foto AG
- Creative Foto AG with its legal headquarters in Hildisrieden is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Photography, Operation of photo labs». Creative Foto AG is active.
- The company was founded on 22.08.1989.
- The last commercial register change was made on 22.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Creative Foto AG is the following: CHE-101.409.898.
- 2 various trademarks or applications have been registered by the company Creative Foto AG in the IPI.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Polinelli Holding AG, Polinelli Immobilien GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
Claudio Polinelli,
Milena Polinelli,
Werner Adolf Polinelli,
Rita Polinelli-Lupart
newest authorized signatories
Claudio Polinelli,
Milena Polinelli,
Werner Adolf Polinelli,
Rita Polinelli-Lupart
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.08.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hildisrieden
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.012.029-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.409.898
Sector
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Labor- und allgemeine Fotoarbeiten, Fotoreportagen, Schul- und Kindergartenfotografie, digitale Bildbearbeitung sowie Herstellung von und Handel mit Druckerzeugnissen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Halten und Veräusserung von Lizenzen, Marken und Patenten; Kauf, Verkauf, Überbauung, Halten und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Mahler Treuhand GmbH | Engelberg | 02.03.2018 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Franz Haas Treuhand AG | Meggen | 25.01.2017 | 01.03.2018 | |
Franz Haas Treuhand | Meggen | 09.05.2014 | 24.01.2017 | |
Kaibac AG | Luzern | <2004 | 08.05.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
06.07.2018 | active | 50256/2018 | |
04.03.2015 | active | 61343/2014 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Creative Foto AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006090177, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Creative Foto AG, in Hildisrieden, CHE-101.409.898, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2018, Publ. 4341569).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sezer, Mukatdes, von Emmen, in Emmen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4341569, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Creative Foto AG, in Hildisrieden, CHE-101.409.898, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2018, Publ. 4088015).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Paunovski, Miroslav, von Horw, in Kriens, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4088015, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Creative Foto AG, in Hildisrieden, CHE-101.409.898, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2017, Publ. 3313035).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Franz Haas Treuhand AG (CHE-423.162.495), in Meggen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Martin Mahler Treuhand GmbH (CHE-105.657.840), in Engelberg, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.